RI S2743 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Brings the Rhode Island Life and Health Guaranty Fund statute into conformance with the latest version of the National Association of Insurance Commissioners Model Act.
Title
Rhode Island Life And Health Guaranty Association Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |