RI S2741 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- OFFICE OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES - Requires school districts to provide the parent/guardian of a student with an individualized education program (IEP) with information concerning the achieving a better life experience (ABLE) account program benefits and the program application process.
Title
Requires school districts to provide the parent/guardian of a student with an individualized education program (IEP) with information concerning the achieving a better life experience (ABLE) account program benefits and the program application process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-06 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-05-31 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/06/2024) |
2024-05-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2024) |
2024-05-23 | House | Referred to House Education |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2024) |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2024) |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2024) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |