RI S2741 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Hearing: May 23 House Corporations Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Eastland Builders, Inc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Eastland Builders, Inc.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-20HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-05-15HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2018)
2018-03-28HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-03-27SenateSenate read and passed
2018-03-22SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/27/2018)
2018-03-20SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback