RI S2740 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds a new chapter known as the Labor Standards in Renewable Energy Projects.
Title
Labor Standards In Renewable Energy Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 4 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage of Sub A (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 4 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage of Sub A (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | House | House passed Sub B |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2022-06-19 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-16 | House | Committee transferred to House Corporations |
2022-05-26 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/19/2022) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |