RI S2740 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows railroad companies who hold a Class G license to serve alcohol at retail aboard its trains and in its controlled station premises up to 60 minutes prior to a train's scheduled departure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-05-02SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/02/2018)
2018-04-25SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-20SenateScheduled for consideration (04/25/2018)
2018-03-28SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-03-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback