RI S2738 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that surcharges on credit card transactions may only be permitted when certain notice requirements are adhered to and provides for a misdemeanor penalty of five hundred dollars ($500) and/or one year in jail in any violations.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions--surcharges On Credit Card Transactions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/19/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |