RI S2715 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance (would Rename The Rhode Island Insurers Insolvency Fund The Rhode Island Property And Casualty Insurance Guaranty Association And Would Amend The Chapter To Bring It Into Compliance With The Current Naic Model Act Upon Which The Statute Is Based)
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance (would Rename The Rhode Island Insurers Insolvency Fund The Rhode Island Property And Casualty Insurance Guaranty Association And Would Amend The Chapter To Bring It Into Compliance With The Current Naic Model Act Upon Which The Statute Is Based)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-19 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence | |
2010-06-10 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-27 | House passed Sub B | |
2010-05-25 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-05-25 | Committee recommends passage of Sub B | |
2010-05-25 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-05 | Referred to House Corporations | |
2010-05-04 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-04-27 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-04-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-06 | Committee heard | |
2010-04-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-30 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-03-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-24 | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2715.pdf |