RI S2705 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the zoning board (Z.B.) to send notices, and decisions to locally registered neighborhood groups, require as tax exempt by IRS and would allow them to appeal Z.B. decisions.
Title
Zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2014) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2705.pdf |