RI S2697 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands dental insurance coverage, prohibits certain deductions and requires coverage where there is a pre-existing conditions or any earlier treatments. Annual reports must be publicized and filed with the department of health.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies--dental Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] |
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2022) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2697.pdf |