RI S2691 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the PUC to initiate the process of evaluating the barriers to and opportunities for electric energy storage resources to be connected to the electric distribution system.
Title
2022 Energy Storage Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2022) |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/11/2022) |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2022) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |