RI S2687 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voids any provision of a settlement that prohibits disclosure of the factual information related to a claim of sexual harassment, retaliation for reporting sexual harassment, and stalking as against public policy.
Title
Procedure Generally -- Nondisclosure Agreements
Sponsors
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |