RI S2686 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Middletown municipal court to impose fines not exceeding one thousand dollars ($1,000.00) for the violation of the town's short-term residential leases ordinance. Such violation shall be considered a civil violation.
Title
General Powers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-04 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed Sub B |
2018-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2018-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-21 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2018) |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2018) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/08/2018) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |