RI S2682 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allow barbers, hairdressers, cosmeticians, manicurists and estheticians to provide their services outside of their salon as part of a special occasion event such as a wedding or prom.
Title
Barbers, Hairdressers, Cosmeticians, Manicurists And Estheticians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/29/2014) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2014) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2014) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |