RI S2675 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- THE RHODE ISLAND CIVIL RIGHTS ENFORCEMENT ACT - Provides a remedy for any harm caused due to a deprivation or violation of rights by the State of Rhode Island or its political and/or administrative units or subdivisions, secured by the Constitution of the State of Rhode Island.
Title
Provides a remedy for any harm caused due to a deprivation or violation of rights by the State of Rhode Island or its political and/or administrative units or subdivisions, secured by the Constitution of the State of Rhode Island.
Sponsors
Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
State Affairs And Government
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- THE RHODE ISLAND CIVIL RIGHTS ENFORCEMENT ACT
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- THE RHODE ISLAND CIVIL RIGHTS ENFORCEMENT ACT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2675.pdf |