RI S2675 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Imposes size and weight restrictions on through traffic on Forest Avenue, Middletown.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Size, Weight And Load Limits--middletown

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-21HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-04-06HouseReferred to House Municipal Government
2018-04-05SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/05/2018)
2018-03-28SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-03-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback