RI S2675 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that ratemaking mechanisms shall not be relied upon or cited by the PUC for making adjustments in determining an electric or gas distribution company's cost of capital.
Title
Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/13/2016) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2016) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |