RI S2672 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefines the term "covered services" as used to describe applicable subscriber agreements between a health care entity and a dentist, to exclude waiting period and alternate benefit provisions.
Title
Health Care Accessibility And Quality Assurance Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (04/03/2018) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2672.pdf |