RI S2667 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a new personal income tax credit for individuals who incur expenses caring for a relative that requires assistance with one or more daily living activities as certified by a license physician.
Title
Personal Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2667.pdf |