RI S2665 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a small business development fund to encourage formation of private capital investment by federally-licensed investment companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing A Small Business Development Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseReferred to House Finance
2018-06-21SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-06-21SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-21SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-20SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2018)
2018-05-10SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2018)
2018-03-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback