RI S2658 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - Meeting postponed (08/05/2020)
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires individual health insurers, large group health insurers and small employer health insurers to provide coverage for ten (10) categories of essential health benefits listed in the act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual Health Insurance Coverage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-03SenateMeeting postponed (08/05/2020)
2020-07-31SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback