RI S2656 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits the town of West Greenwich to create five (5) year tax liens on real estate owned by infirm and indigent persons in lieu of paying regular taxes where those persons have been determined as unable to pay by the assessor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Subject To Taxation - Exemption For Indigent And Infirm Persons In The Town Of West Greenwich

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-19HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-06-14HouseReferred to House Municipal Government
2018-06-13SenateSenate read and passed
2018-06-07SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2018)
2018-05-29SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-25SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-03-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback