RI S2653 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes glass from the materials not permitted as cover materials by the resource recovery corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Resource Recovery Corporation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateSigned by Governor
2018-05-30SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-30HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-05-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/30/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-04-12HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-04-11SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-05SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/11/2018)
2018-04-04SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-30SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018)
2018-03-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback