RI S2648 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $17,700,000 For The Purposes Of Increasing Home Care Provider Reimbursement Rates To Be Used For Wage Pass Through To Direct Care Staff And For Increases In Payments To Direct Care Workers Hired By Consumers Through Self-directed Care Programs (this Joint Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $17,700,000 In Order To Increase Home Care Provider Reimbursement Rates, And For Increases In Payments To Direct Care Workers.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $17,700,000 For The Purposes Of Increasing Home Care Provider Reimbursement Rates To Be Used For Wage Pass Through To Direct Care Staff And For Increases In Payments To Direct Care Workers Hired By Consumers Through Self-directed Care Programs (this Joint Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $17,700,000 In Order To Increase Home Care Provider Reimbursement Rates, And For Increases In Payments To Direct Care Workers.)
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2022) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2648.pdf |