RI S2646 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Commissioner of elementary and secondary education would be appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate and serves at the pleasure of the governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Council On Elementary And Secondary Education [see Title 16 Chapter 97 - The Rhode Island Board Of Education]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-04-05SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/05/2018)
2018-03-28SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-03-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback