RI S2641 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the use of certain criminal records and credit history reports in denying housing to prospective applicants, provides fines for failure to comply and requires notice of denials be sent to the prospective tenants.
Title
Fair Chance In Housing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] |
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2022) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2641.pdf |