RI S2639 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Placed on House Calendar (05/30/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that school district safety assessments be provided to the Rhode Island school safety committee every three (3) years for review and recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health And Safety Of Pupils

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/30/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-04-26HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-04-25SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/25/2018)
2018-04-11SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-04-06SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018)
2018-03-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback