RI S2637 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- CONDOMINIUM LAW - Restricts increases in monthly common expenses and limit special assessments to cover unforeseen costs not included in the association’s approved annual budget for common expenses in associations where the minority of the units are deed restricted units.
Title
Restricts increases in monthly common expenses and limit special assessments to cover unforeseen costs not included in the association’s approved annual budget for common expenses in associations where the minority of the units are deed restricted units.
Sponsors
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] | Sen. Victoria Gu [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2637.pdf |