RI S2636 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Motor Vehicle Offenses (would Repeal The Enhancement Of Penalties For Subsequent Offenses Of Driving Under The Influence, Death Resulting And Driving Under The Influence Resulting In Serious Bodily Injury)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Motor Vehicle Offenses (would Repeal The Enhancement Of Penalties For Subsequent Offenses Of Driving Under The Influence, Death Resulting And Driving Under The Influence Resulting In Serious Bodily Injury)
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] | Sen. Christopher Maselli [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-07 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-09-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-10 | House passed as amended in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-20 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-05-20 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2636.pdf |