RI S2634 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Criminalizes residential mortgage fraud and extends the statute of limitations for certain criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fraud And False Dealing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-22SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-03-18SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2016)
2016-02-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback