RI S2628 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Meeting postponed (03/31/2022)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Meeting postponed (03/31/2022)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the city of Warwick to prohibit the sale of firearms within five hundred feet (500 ft.) of any school or daycare facility.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/31/2022) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2628.pdf |