RI S2624 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the felony crime of online impersonation concerning all types of electronic communication.
Title
Computer Crime
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub B |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2014-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2014) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |