RI S2620 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires department of health to establish an informal dispute resolution to address any changes to department of health violations.
Title
Assisted Living Residence Licensing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2022) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2620.pdf |