RI S2607 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-27 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-27 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Property And Works - Labor And Payment Of Debts By Contractors (would Include Persons Who Remove Debris From Public Works Sites In The Definition Of "employee" With Respect To Prevailing Wage Requirements)
Title
An Act Relating To Public Property And Works - Labor And Payment Of Debts By Contractors (would Include Persons Who Remove Debris From Public Works Sites In The Definition Of "employee" With Respect To Prevailing Wage Requirements)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Referred to House Labor | |
2010-05-26 | Senate read and passed | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-19 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-05-19 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-04-14 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-04-14 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2607.pdf |