RI S2603 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the interest rate to six percent (6%) per annum on any child or spousal support debt due or owing, to be assessed at the discretion of the family court.
Title
Divorce And Separation
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2014) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2603.pdf |