RI S2598 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that electors that cast emergency ballots in the 12 day period prior to any election day sign an electronic pollbook giving a reason why they cannot get to the polls and vote be cast immediately into a voting machine.
Title
Mail Ballots
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2020-07-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2020-07-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-07-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/09/2020) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |