RI S2598 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes an assault or battery that causes unconsciousness, known as a "knockout assault," a felony, punishable by imprisonment for not more than (3) years, or a fine of not more than ($1,500), or both.
Title
Assaults
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/15/2014) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/29/2014) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2014) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |