RI S2597 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Katie Beckett Program pursuant to federal guidelines.
Title
Medical Assistance
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2022) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2597.pdf |