RI S2595 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the tax administrator to provide to the general assembly data regarding immigrant taxpayers’ tax filings for two (2) tax years, and reports its findings to the general assembly.
Title
State Tax Officials
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Finance: Be held for further study (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2022) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |