RI S2592 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the “Rhode Island Hard-Hit Emergency Liquidity Program Act” to provide up to twenty million dollars ($20,000,000) to businesses adversely affected by the Coronavirus pandemic by providing aid for drop in sales.
Title
Rhode Island Hard-hit Liquidity Program Act
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2022) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2592.pdf |