RI S2584 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/27/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Internet service providers to provide digital blocking of sexual content and patently offensive material. It would allow consumers to deactivate digital block upon payment of a twenty dollar ($20.00) fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet Digital Blocking

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateWithdrawn at sponsor's request (03/27/2018)
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback