RI S2581 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the dissemination of any indecent image of another person without authorization for the purpose of harassing, intimidating, threatening another person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Imaging Devices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateSigned by Governor
2018-05-30SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-30HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-05-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/30/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-04-11HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2018-04-10SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/10/2018)
2018-03-27SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback