RI S2567 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the walking of any domestic animal on the grounds of the Veterans' Memorial Cemetery in Exeter. An exception would be made for service dogs. Violations would be punished by a fine of not less than five hundred dollars ($500).
Title
Burial Of Veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2016) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |