RI S2562 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a consumer report agency may not charge a consumer a fee for any security freeze service. Effective September 1, 2018.
Title
Consumer Empowerment And Identity Prevention Act Of 2006
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-12 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-06-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2018) |
2018-06-05 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2018) |
2018-06-01 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2018) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2018) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |