RI S2561 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the "lookback period" for second and subsequent offenses involving driving under the influence of alcohol or drugs under § 31-27-2, and for offenses related to failure or refusal to submit to chemical tests under § 31-27-2.1 from 5 yrs to10 yrs.
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2561.pdf |