RI S2557 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Amends several provisions relative to truck size and weight limitations to be compatible with federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Definitions And General Code Provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - General code provisions (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-14HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-14SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-12SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/14/2018)
2018-06-12HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/12/2018)
2018-06-05HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for consideration (06/05/2018)
2018-05-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-04-11HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-04-10SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/10/2018)
2018-03-28SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback