RI S2556 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the I-195 Redevelopment commission to make certain alterations to the boundaries of a portion of the I-195 redevelopment called "Parcel P4".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The I-195 Redevlopment Act Of 2011

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseCommittee transferred to House Finance
2018-03-23HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-03-22SenateSenate read and passed
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (03/22/2018)
2018-03-14SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-07SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018)
2018-03-06SenateMeeting postponed (03/07/2018)
2018-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback