RI S2556 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the I-195 Redevelopment commission to make certain alterations to the boundaries of a portion of the I-195 redevelopment called "Parcel P4".
Title
The I-195 Redevlopment Act Of 2011
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2018-03-23 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/22/2018) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/07/2018) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |