RI S2554 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Rhode Island Livable Home Modification Grant allowing individuals to retrofit their residence to nationally recognized accessibility standards and receive fifty percent (50%) of the total sum spent, up to five thousand dollars ($5,000).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Livable Home Modification Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Ri livable home modification act approval of amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseReferred to House Municipal Government
2018-05-29SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/29/2018)
2018-05-22SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for consideration (05/22/2018)
2018-04-25SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-20SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback