RI S2553 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DHS to seek Medicaid section 1115 waivers to provide caregiver support services for family caregivers, and provides for the creation of annual reports by DHS to track the number of caregiver assessments given by the department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Caregivers Support Act Of 2013

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Family caregivers support act approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-01SenateSenate passed as amended (floor amendment)
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/01/2018)
2018-04-24SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-19SenateScheduled for consideration (04/24/2018)
2018-04-12SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-06SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback