RI S2551 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes aging/disability resource center within division of elderly affairs as part of long-term care system for elderly/disabled persons/family caregivers/providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Rhode Island Aging And Disability Resource Center

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-08SenateSenate read and passed
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/08/2018)
2018-05-01SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-27SenateScheduled for consideration (05/01/2018)
2018-04-12SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-06SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback